California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013