LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1126
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1126
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1126
Compare Versions
AB1126 Chaptered September 28, 2013
AB1126 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 30, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 14, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 12, 2013
AB1126 Amended June 19, 2013
AB1126 Amended May 8, 2013
AB1126 Amended April 18, 2013
AB1126 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1126 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1126 Chaptered September 28, 2013
AB1126 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 30, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 14, 2013
AB1126 Amended August 12, 2013
AB1126 Amended June 19, 2013
AB1126 Amended May 8, 2013
AB1126 Amended April 18, 2013
AB1126 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1126 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare