Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 1660.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|