California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2013

Amended

Bill August 27, 2013
Bill July 9, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013