LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB114
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB114
Compare Versions
AB114 Amended August 27, 2013
AB114 Amended July 9, 2013
AB114 Amended May 8, 2013
AB114 Amended April 23, 2013
AB114 Amended April 9, 2013
AB114 Introduced January 14, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB114 Amended August 27, 2013
AB114 Amended July 9, 2013
AB114 Amended May 8, 2013
AB114 Amended April 23, 2013
AB114 Amended April 9, 2013
AB114 Introduced January 14, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare