|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3087.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2232.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1387.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|