LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB119
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB119
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB119
Compare Versions
AB119 Chaptered September 28, 2013
AB119 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB119 Amended August 30, 2013
AB119 Amended August 28, 2013
AB119 Amended August 14, 2013
AB119 Amended August 12, 2013
AB119 Amended July 2, 2013
AB119 Amended June 19, 2013
AB119 Amended April 16, 2013
AB119 Amended April 1, 2013
AB119 Introduced January 14, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB119 Chaptered September 28, 2013
AB119 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB119 Amended August 30, 2013
AB119 Amended August 28, 2013
AB119 Amended August 14, 2013
AB119 Amended August 12, 2013
AB119 Amended July 2, 2013
AB119 Amended June 19, 2013
AB119 Amended April 16, 2013
AB119 Amended April 1, 2013
AB119 Introduced January 14, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare