California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill August 28, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013