|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 6621.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4733.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 1468.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|