LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1324
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1324
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1324
Compare Versions
AB1324 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1324 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1324 Amended August 7, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 2, 2014
AB1324 Amended May 5, 2014
AB1324 Amended May 2, 2013
AB1324 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1324 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1324 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1324 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1324 Amended August 7, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1324 Amended June 2, 2014
AB1324 Amended May 5, 2014
AB1324 Amended May 2, 2013
AB1324 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1324 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare