California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 7, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013