|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 6558.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4863.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 6. Page 3722.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1144.) Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|