California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill January 23, 2014
Bill January 9, 2014
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013