LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1327
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1327
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1327
Compare Versions
AB1327 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1327 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1327 Amended June 19, 2014
AB1327 Amended May 5, 2014
AB1327 Amended January 23, 2014
AB1327 Amended January 9, 2014
AB1327 Amended April 29, 2013
AB1327 Amended April 18, 2013
AB1327 Amended April 3, 2013
AB1327 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1327 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1327 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1327 Amended June 19, 2014
AB1327 Amended May 5, 2014
AB1327 Amended January 23, 2014
AB1327 Amended January 9, 2014
AB1327 Amended April 29, 2013
AB1327 Amended April 18, 2013
AB1327 Amended April 3, 2013
AB1327 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare