|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 3121.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 1568.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|