LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1358
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1358
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1358
Compare Versions
AB1358 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB1358 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1358 Amended September 3, 2013
AB1358 Amended July 11, 2013
AB1358 Amended June 27, 2013
AB1358 Amended April 15, 2013
AB1358 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1358 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB1358 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1358 Amended September 3, 2013
AB1358 Amended July 11, 2013
AB1358 Amended June 27, 2013
AB1358 Amended April 15, 2013
AB1358 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare