California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 11, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013