|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 280, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5946.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4597.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|