California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 3, 2014
Bill May 28, 2014