LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1438
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1438
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1438
Compare Versions
AB1438 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1438 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1438 Amended June 3, 2014
AB1438 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1438 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1438 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1438 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1438 Amended June 3, 2014
AB1438 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1438 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare