|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6557.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4858.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4942.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|