LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1442
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1442
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1442
Compare Versions
AB1442 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1442 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1442 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1442 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1442 Amended June 5, 2014
AB1442 Amended May 1, 2014
AB1442 Amended April 7, 2014
AB1442 Amended March 25, 2014
AB1442 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1442 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1442 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1442 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1442 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1442 Amended June 5, 2014
AB1442 Amended May 1, 2014
AB1442 Amended April 7, 2014
AB1442 Amended March 25, 2014
AB1442 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare