California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 5, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014