|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6039.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4410.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|