LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1511
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1511
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1511
Compare Versions
AB1511 Chaptered September 19, 2014
AB1511 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB1511 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 24, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 19, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 3, 2014
AB1511 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1511 Introduced January 14, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1511 Chaptered September 19, 2014
AB1511 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB1511 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 24, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 19, 2014
AB1511 Amended June 3, 2014
AB1511 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1511 Introduced January 14, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare