California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill June 3, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014