|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6653.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4902.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 5008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Measure version as amended on April 8 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|