LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1513
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1513
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1513
Compare Versions
AB1513 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB1513 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1513 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1513 Amended August 6, 2014
AB1513 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1513 Amended May 6, 2014
AB1513 Amended April 24, 2014
AB1513 Amended April 8, 2014
AB1513 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1513 Introduced January 15, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1513 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB1513 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1513 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1513 Amended August 6, 2014
AB1513 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1513 Amended May 6, 2014
AB1513 Amended April 24, 2014
AB1513 Amended April 8, 2014
AB1513 Amended March 17, 2014
AB1513 Introduced January 15, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare