California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 6, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014