|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6466.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4825.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5288.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|