California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014