BILL NUMBER: AB 1527ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 25, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Perea JANUARY 17, 2014 An act to add Section 116760.40.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public water systems. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1527, Perea. Public water systems: Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund. Existing law, the Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund Law of 1997, establishes the Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund to provide grants or revolving fund loans for the design and construction of projects for public water systems that will enable those systems to meet safe drinking water standards. Existing law requires the State Water Resources Control Board to implement this law pursuant to the adoption of a policy handbook. This bill would require the State Water Resources Control Board to provide incentives for the consolidation of public water systems based upon a service review developed by a local agency formation commission. This bill would repeal these provisions as of January 1 of the next calendar year occurring after the board provides notice to the Legislature and the Secretary of State and posts notice on its Internet Web site that the board has adopted a policy handbook. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 116760.40.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 116760.40.5. (a) The board shall provide incentives for the consolidation of public water systems based upon a service review developed by a local agency formation commission pursuant to Section 56430 of the Government Code. (b) This section is repealed as of January 1 of the next calendar year occurring after the board provides notice to the Legislature and the Secretary of State and posts notice on its Internet Web site that the board has adopted a policy handbook pursuant to Section 116760.43.