|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2765.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1976.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1664.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|