LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB154
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB154
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB154
Compare Versions
AB154 Chaptered October 9, 2013
AB154 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB154 Amended June 24, 2013
AB154 Amended April 30, 2013
AB154 Amended March 19, 2013
AB154 Introduced January 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB154 Chaptered October 9, 2013
AB154 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB154 Amended June 24, 2013
AB154 Amended April 30, 2013
AB154 Amended March 19, 2013
AB154 Introduced January 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare