California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill June 24, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013