|
08/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2192.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1489.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1381.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|