LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB164
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB164
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB164
Compare Versions
AB164 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB164 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB164 Amended June 5, 2013
AB164 Amended May 13, 2013
AB164 Introduced January 23, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB164 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB164 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB164 Amended June 5, 2013
AB164 Amended May 13, 2013
AB164 Introduced January 23, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare