California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2013

Amended

Bill June 5, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013