|
07/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5800.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4194.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5002.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4965.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|