California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 15, 2014