LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1727
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1727
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1727
Compare Versions
AB1727 Chaptered July 21, 2014
AB1727 Enrolled July 8, 2014
AB1727 Amended June 15, 2014
AB1727 Amended May 15, 2014
AB1727 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1727 Chaptered July 21, 2014
AB1727 Enrolled July 8, 2014
AB1727 Amended June 15, 2014
AB1727 Amended May 15, 2014
AB1727 Introduced February 14, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare