|
07/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5804.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4194.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 4760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|