California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1928 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 18, 2014

Amended

Bill June 23, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 26, 2014