LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1928
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1928
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1928
Compare Versions
AB1928 Chaptered July 18, 2014
AB1928 Enrolled July 8, 2014
AB1928 Amended June 23, 2014
AB1928 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1928 Amended April 21, 2014
AB1928 Amended March 26, 2014
AB1928 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1928 Chaptered July 18, 2014
AB1928 Enrolled July 8, 2014
AB1928 Amended June 23, 2014
AB1928 Amended June 4, 2014
AB1928 Amended April 21, 2014
AB1928 Amended March 26, 2014
AB1928 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare