|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5950.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4371.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5114.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|