California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1937 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 20, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014