LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1937
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1937
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1937
Compare Versions
AB1937 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1937 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1937 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1937 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1937 Amended May 20, 2014
AB1937 Amended May 6, 2014
AB1937 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1937 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1937 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB1937 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB1937 Amended June 30, 2014
AB1937 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1937 Amended May 20, 2014
AB1937 Amended May 6, 2014
AB1937 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1937 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare