|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4458.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4761.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|