LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2069
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2069
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2069
Compare Versions
AB2069 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB2069 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 2, 2014
AB2069 Amended March 20, 2014
AB2069 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2069 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB2069 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2069 Amended April 2, 2014
AB2069 Amended March 20, 2014
AB2069 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare