California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2069 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014